In this post we will discuss multiplication of whole numbers.

Here we will understand multiplication by two methods.

(a) Multiplication in parts

(b) Multiplication by column

After the concept we will move on to solve some related Grade 5 Math Questions

**Multi digit Multiplication**

We will understand the concept with the help of examples.

Let us start with the easy ones

**Multiply 3 digit with 1 digit number**

**Example 01**

498 x 5

**Method 01 (Multiplication in Parts)**

Using Distributive Property of Multiplication which says:

a (b + c) = ab + ac

498 x 5 can be written as:

⟹ (400 + 90 + 8 ) x 5

Using Distributive Property of Multiplication

⟹ (400 x 5) + (90 x 5) + (8 x 5)

⟹ (2000) + (450) + (40)

⟹ 2490

**2490 is the right answer**

**Method 2 (Multiplication in Columns)**

Follow the below steps:**(a) Place Values**

⟹ Find Place values of given numbers

⟹ Arrange number vertically such that digit with same place values are in same line

**(b) Multiply Numbers**

⟹ Multiply 5 with 8

5 x 8 = 40

We will write 0 and 4 will be carried to Tens Place

⟹ Multiply 5 with 9

5 x 5 = 45

And we also add the number 4 in carry

45 + 4 = 49

we will write 9 and 4 will be carried to Hundred Place

⟹ Multiply 5 with 4

5 x 4 = 20

And we also add the number 4 in carry

20 + 4 = 24

we will write 24 in the result

**2490 is the solution**

**Example 02**

640 x 7

**Method 01 (Multiplication in Parts)**

640 x 7 can be written as

⟹ (600 + 40) x 7

⟹ (600 x 7) + (40 x 7)

⟹ (4200) + (280)

⟹ 4480

**4480 is the right answer**

**Method 2 (Multiplication in Columns)**

(a) **Place Value**

⟹ Find Place values of given numbers

⟹ Arrange the number in column so digit with same place value are in same vertical line

(b) **Multiply Numbers**

⟹ Multiply 7 with 0

7 x 0 = 0

we write 0 in the main solution

⟹ **Multiply 7 with 4**

7 x 4 = 28

we write 8 in main solution and 2 is carried over to Hundred Place

⟹ **Multiply 7 with 6**

7 x 6 = 42

Add the number 2 in carry

42 + 2 = 44

Write 44 in part of main solution

**4480 is the right answer**

Now lets move on to solve some difficult questions which involves multi digit numbers

**Multiply 3 digit and 2 digit number**

**Example 01****453 x 36**

We will solve this question using column method

**(a) Place Value**

Find Place Value of given numbers

Arrange them vertically such that digit with same place value are in same line

**(b) Multiply Numbers **

**One’s Column Multiplication**

⟹ Multiply 6 with 3

6 x 3 = 18

we write 8 in the solution and 1 is carried over to Tens Place

⟹ Multiply 6 with 5

6 x 5 = 30

Now add number 1 present in carry

30 + 1 = 31

we write 1 in the main solution and 3 is carried over to Hundred Place

⟹ Multiply 6 with 4

6 x 4 = 24

Now add number 3 present in carry

24 + 3 = 27

we write 27 in the main solution

Here Multiplication with One’s Column is completed.

Now move on to Ten’s Column calculation. Before than mark ” X ” (which is 0) in one’s column

**Ten’s Column Multiplication**

⟹ Multiply 3 with 3

3 x 3 = 9

write 9 in main solution

⟹Multiply 3 with 5

3 x 5 = 15

write 5 in main solution and 1 is carried over to hundred place

⟹Multiply 3 with 4

3 x 4 = 12

Also add 1 present in carry

12 + 1 = 13

write 13 in main solution

Here Multiplication of Ten’s Column is completed

Add all the solution columns

**16308 is the answer**

**Example 02****721 x 48**

Solving the question using column method

(a) **Place Value**

Find Place Value and arrange the numbers vertically

(b) **Multiply Numbers**

**One’s Column Multiplication**

⟹ Multiply 8 with 1

8 x 1 = 8

Write 8 in the main solution

⟹ Multiply 8 with 2

8 x 2 = 16

Write 6 in the main solution and 1 is carried over to Hundred Place

⟹ Multiply 8 with 7

8 x 7 = 56

Add 1 which is present in carry

56 + 1 = 57

Write 57 in the main solution

**Ten’s Column Multiplication**

Mark “X” in **One column**

⟹ Multiply 4 with 1

4 x 1 = 4

Write 4 in main solution

⟹ Multiply 4 with 2

4 x 2 = 8

Write 8 in main solution

⟹ Multiply 4 with 7

4 x 7 = 28

Write 28 in main solution

Add all the solution column

**34608 is the solution**

**Multiply 4 digit with 2 digit**

**Example 01**

6583 x 62

(a) **Place Value**

Find place value of numbers and arrange them vertically such that number with same place value are in same line

(b) **Multiply Numbers**

**One’s Column Multiplication**

⟹ Multiply 2 with 3

2 x 3 = 6

Write 6 in main solution

⟹ Multiply 2 with 8

2 x 8 = 16

Write 6 in main solution and 1 is carried over to Hundred Place

⟹ Multiply 2 with 5

2 x 5 = 10

Also add 1 present in carry

10 + 1 = 11

Write 1 in main solution and 1 is carried over to Thousand Place

⟹ Multiply 2 with 6

2 x 6 = 12

Also add 1 present in carry

12 + 1 = 13

Write 13 in main solution

We are done with One’s column multiplication

**Ten’s column multiplication**

Mark X in One’s column

⟹ Multiply 6 with 3

6 x 3 = 18

Write 8 in the solution and 1 is carried over to Tens Place

⟹ Multiply 6 with 8

6 x 8 = 48

Add 1 present in carry

1 + 48 = 49

Write 9 in main solution and 4 is carried over to Hundred’s Place

⟹ Multiply 6 with 5

6 x 5 = 30

Add 4 present in carry

30 + 4 = 34

Write 4 in main solution and 3 is carried over to Thousand Place

⟹ Multiply 6 with 6

6 x 6 = 36

Add 3 present in carry

36 + 3 = 39

write 39 in main solution

Now add the two columns

**408146 is the solution**

**Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit number**

**Example 01****726 x 654**

(a) **Place value**

Find Place Value and arrange the number vertically

**(b) Ones Column Multiplication**

⟹ Multiply 4 with 6

4 x 6 = 24

write number 4 in solution and carry 2 on Tens Place

⟹ Multiply 4 with 2

4 x 2 = 8

Add number 2 in carry

8 + 2 = 10

write number 0 in solution and carry 1 on Hundred Place

⟹ Multiply 4 with 7

4 x 7 = 28

Add number 1 in carry

28 + 1 = 29

write number 29 in solution

(c) **Tens Column Multiplication**

Mark X in **Ones Column**

⟹ Multiply 5 with 6

5 x 6 = 30

Write 0 in solution and 3 is carried over to Tens Place

⟹ Multiply 5 with 2

5 x 2 = 10

Add number 3 in carry

10 + 3 = 13

write number 3 in solution and 1 is carried over to Hundred Place

⟹ Multiply 5 with 7

5 x 7 = 35

Add number 1 in carry

35 + 1 = 36

write 36 in solution

(d) **Hundred Column Multiplication**

Mark X in Ones and Tens Column

⟹ Multiply 6 with 6

6 x 6 = 36

Write 6 in solution and 3 is carried over to Tens Place

⟹ Multiply 6 with 2

6 x 2 = 12

Add number 3 in carry

12 + 3 = 15

write number 5 in solution and 1 is carried over to Hundred Place

⟹ Multiply 6 with 7

6 x 7 = 42

Add number 1 in carry

42 + 1 = 43

write 43 in solution

**Add all the numbers in solution column**

**474804 is the solution**

**Example 02****Multiply 443 x 120**

(a) **Ones Column multiplication**

⟹ Multiply 0 with 3

0 x 3 = 0

Write 0 in solution

⟹ Multiply 0 with 4

0 x 4 = 0

Write 0 in solution

⟹ Multiply 0 with 4

0 x 4 = 0

Write 0 in solution

(b) **Tens Column multiplication**

Put X in the ones column

⟹ Multiply 2 with 3

2 x 3 = 6

Write 6 in solution

⟹ Multiply 2 with 4

2 x 4 = 8

Write 8 in solution

⟹ Multiply 2 with 4

2 x 4 = 8

Write 8 in solution

(c) **Hundreds Column multiplication**

Put X in the Ones and Tens column

⟹ Multiply 1 with 3

1 x 3 = 3

Write 3 in solution

⟹ Multiply 1 with 4

1 x 4 = 4

Write 4 in solution

⟹ Multiply 1 with 4

1 x 4 = 4

Write 4 in solution

(d) **Add all the numbers in solution**

**53160 is the solution**

**Multiplication Worksheet Grade 5**

Here we will discuss some important multiplication problems.

All the questions are to the standard of Grade 5

Explanation/Solution are also provided for each question

**Basic Multiplication**

Here two numbers are given in the question.

You have to multiply the numbers and find the solution

(01) **Multiply 517 x 82**

(02) **Multiply 65 x 74**

**4810 is the solution**

(03) **Multiply 748 x 27**

**20196 is the solution**

(04) **Multiply 617 and 315**

**194355 is the solution**

(05) **Multiply 403 x 414**

**166842 is the solution**

(06) **Multiply 855 x 93**

**79515 is the solution**

(07) **Multiply 942 x 27**

**25434 is the solution**

(08) **Multiply 322 x 638**

**205436 is the solution**

(09) **Multiply 69 x 92**

**6348 is the solution**

(10) **Multiply 66 x 42**

**2772 is the solution**

(11) **Multiply 44 x 67**

**2948 is the solution**

(12) **Multiply 717 x 342**

**245214 is the solution**

(13) **Multiply 450 x 72**

**32400 is the solution**

(14) **Multiply 141 x 144**

**20304 is the solution**

(15)** Multiply 547 x 809**

**442523 is the solution**

** Missing digits in Multiplication**

Given below are the images of multiplication with empty boxes.

You have to complete the multiplication and fill up the empty boxes.

(01) **371 x 93**

(02) **145 x 69**

(03) **653 x 55 **

(04) **456 x 139**

(05) **632 x 731**

(6) Multiply and find the missing digits in below image

Read Solution(07) **Multiply 225 x 79 and find the missing boxes**

(08) **Fill up the empty boxes**

(09)** Do the multiplication and fill up the missing digits**

(10) **Find the missing digits in below multiplication**